Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Argos Usa Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leeper, Jeffrey Stephen, against Legion Contracting Services Inc, represented by Binney, Geoffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2019 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House011th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: January 25, 2020Petition for Money Damages
Date: March 27, 2019Proposed Consent Judgment
Date: August 08, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: March 27, 2019AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: March 09, 2020Proposed Consent Judgment
Date: March 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE DISP |
||
March 09, 2020 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
March 09, 2020 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Consent Judgment | |
February 24, 2020 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Law Day Docket O/S 3-9 |
||
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Status Conference | |
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
January 25, 2020 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
January 24, 2020 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.