Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Briggs, Robert A, filed a(n) Breach of Rental - Commercial case represented by Green, William T. Iii, against Compass Bank, represented by Huttenbach, William Patterson, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2019 |
CategoryLease |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Rental |
Filing Court House151st |
Plaintiff's Answers and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories
Date: June 03, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: July 12, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: June 26, 2020Defendant's Original Answer, Counterclaim, and Request for Disclosure
Date: May 03, 2019Proposed Agreed Order for Continuance
Date: July 10, 2020Plaintiff's Sur-Response to Defendant's Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 30, 2019Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: May 19, 2020Proposed Final Summary Judgment
Date: September 13, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 13, 2019Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Request for Admissions
Date: June 03, 2019Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Traditional and No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 28, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2020Proposed order
Date: December 23, 2019Plaintiff's Request for Rule 194 Disclosures to Defendant
Date: July 15, 2019Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: July 10, 2020Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2019Civil Process Request
Date: March 20, 2019Proposed Agreed Amended Docket Control Order
Date: July 10, 2020Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: March 20, 2019Original Answer of Robert A. Briggs, Jr. to Compass Bank's Counterclaim
Date: May 21, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: July 13, 2020DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: March 08, 2021Plaintiff's First Request For Production of Documents To Defendant
Date: September 21, 2020Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant
Date: September 22, 2020Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories To Defendant
Date: September 21, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE SIGNED
Date: March 09, 2021Proposed Order Granting Hirsch & Westheimer PCs Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: March 08, 2021Plaintiff's First Amended Origianl Petition
Date: December 30, 2019Defendant's Traditional and No-Evidnence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 13, 2019Original Answer and Counterclaim and Request for Disclodure
Date: May 03, 2019Defendant Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: May 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE SIGNED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims AGainst BBVA USA with Prejudice and Nonsuit BBVA USAs Counterclaim with Prejudice | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Hirsch & Westheimer PCs Motion to Withdraw as Counsel | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal of Plaintiffs Claims Against BBVA USA with Prejudice and Nonsuit of BBVA USAs Counterclaim Against Plaintiff with Prejudice | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and Firm Affiliation for Counsel of Record for BBVA USA and Motion for Hirsch & Westheimber to Withdraw as Counsel | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant | |
September 21, 2020 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's First Request For Production of Documents To Defendant | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories To Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.