Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Burleson, filed a(n) Mdl - Opioid Litigation case represented by Deski, Susan Rose Godbehere, against Abbott Laboratories, Actavis Inc, Actavis, Llc,, Actavis Pharma, Inc., F K A Watson Pharma, Inc.,, Allergan Finance Llc, (total of 22) See All represented by Hill, Jack Wesley, Martingano, James G., Mccleary, Roger L., Reed, Noelle Marie, Sarokhanian, Nicholas A., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryMdl - Opioid Litigation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House152nd |
Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Special Apprarance
Date: August 12, 2019Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Jurisdiction
Date: July 30, 2019Allergan PLC's Special Appearance to Present Motion Objecting to Jurisdiction
Date: July 30, 2019Allergan PLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: July 30, 2019NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)
Date: June 17, 2019Defendant's Original Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: February 18, 2019Abbott Laboratories' Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: September 26, 2019Plaintiff Burleson Couty's First Amended Petition
Date: September 30, 2019Exhibit D 2804_Personal_Jurisdiction_Order
Date: September 30, 2019Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy
Date: September 16, 2019SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED
Date: September 20, 2019Proposed Order Granitng Plantiff's Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue To Bankruptcy
Date: September 16, 2019McKesson Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: August 26, 2019Amerisourcebergen Corporation and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Original Answer
Date: August 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 |
SPECIAL APPEARANCE (TRCP 120A) Law Day Docket PER NOTICE OF REMOVAL FLD 10/4/2019 |
||
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Corporate | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation-Mallinckrodt LLC Proof | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation-Specgx LLC POS | |
October 04, 2019 | REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT | ||
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit A Notice of Removal with Exhibits | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's First Amended Notice of Oral and VIdeotaped Deposition of Mallinckrodt PLC | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Subject to and Without Waiving its Special Appearance, Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's First Amended Notice of Oral and Videotaped Deposition of Hugh O'Neill |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.