Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of El Paso, filed a(n) Mdl - Opioid Litigation case represented by Bernal,Jo Anne, against Abbvie Inc, Actavis Inc, Actavis Llc, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance Llc, (total of 25) See All represented by Hill, Jack Wesley, Mcconnico, Stephen E., Perry, Charles Stanton, Raley, Matthew Ryan, Reed, Noelle Marie, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryMdl - Opioid Litigation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House152nd |
Rule 11 Agreement
Date: October 04, 2019El Paso- Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue Due to Bankrupty
Date: September 16, 2019Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue Due to Bankruptcy
Date: September 16, 2019SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED
Date: September 20, 2019Defendant's Original Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: February 18, 2019Allergan PLC's Special Appearance to Present Motion Objection to Jurisdiction
Date: February 18, 2019Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Original Answer
Date: February 18, 2019Allergan PLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: February 19, 2019Proposed Order Sustaining Objection to Jurisdiction
Date: February 18, 2019NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)
Date: June 17, 2019McKesson Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: February 18, 2019Defendant Cardinal Health Inc.'s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition
Date: February 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 |
SPECIAL APPEARANCE (TRCP 120A) Law Day Docket PER RULE 11 AGREEMENT FLD 10/4/2019 |
||
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Undeliverable | |
October 04, 2019 |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (FAMILY) Law Day Docket PER RULE 11 AGREEMENT FLD 10/4/2019 |
||
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | El Paso County Rule 11-signed | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Cover Letter re; El Paso County Rule 11 | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of Hearing on Defendant Allergan PLC's Special Appearance to Present Motion Objectiong to Jurisdiction | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion to Continuance of Hearing of Defendant Allergan PLC's Special Apperance to Present Motion Objecting to Jurisdiction | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Activity |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.