Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kheirbeck, Issam, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Overstreet, James Nathan, Overstreet,James Nathan, against Thomas, Tronown, represented by Hoffpauir, Derek Grant, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 055th with LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House055th |
Civil Process Request
Date: October 19, 2018Plaintiff's Original Petition and Breach of Contract DTPA Violations and Fraud
Date: October 19, 2018Defendants Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 26, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: June 08, 2020Defendants First Amended Answer and Original Counterclaim
Date: June 17, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: April 01, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 12, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 31, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 23, 2021Plaintiff's Response to Trial Preparation Order
Date: February 22, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 29, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: January 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
April 16, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) | ||
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO CLERK | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Response to Trial Preparation Order | |
February 22, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting RESET 60 DAYS |
||
February 22, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting RESET 30 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.