Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nabavi, Amir, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harris, Michael R., against Garcia, Jaime, Lesser, David, Wide-World Entertainment Llc, World-Wide Entertainment And Concerts Llc, represented by Dickson, Kyle L., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 269th with CORY SEPOLIO presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House269th |
Plaintiff's Verified Original Petition
Date: September 14, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: May 01, 2019TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: May 07, 2019Defendant Lesser's First Amended Answer
Date: October 18, 2019DCA Generic Letter
Date: December 06, 2019Plaintiff's Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019Appendix to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019Original Answer and Request for Disclosures
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 13, 2020Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant's Objection
Date: March 16, 2020Defendant Lesser's Response to Plaintiff Nabavi's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 16, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: April 01, 2020ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: April 01, 2020Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: February 13, 2020Notice of Submission for Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 02, 2020Exhibit 01- Docket Control Order
Date: March 16, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 28, 2020DCA Generic Letter
Date: May 19, 2020Nabavi v. Lesser-Post-Mediation Letter to the Court
Date: August 10, 2020TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 04, 2021TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER
Date: May 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
October 04, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant David Lesser’s Notice Of Change Of Firm Address | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER | |
April 05, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING TRIAL | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Notice of Activity | |
August 17, 2020 | FEE AWARDED TO MEDIATOR(Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.