Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sharpstown Civil Association Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mckee, Shawn Robert, against Lu, Yifeng, Wang, Sufen, represented by Fay, Daniel Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2018 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Summary Judgment Signed |
Civil Process Request
Date: April 18, 2018Defendants' General Denial and Request for Disclosure
Date: February 05, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: November 29, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2019Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgement
Date: November 05, 2018Mediation Letter
Date: January 16, 2019Defendants' First Requests for Production to Plaintiff Sharpstown
Date: April 09, 2019Defendants' First Amended General Denial and Request for Disclosure
Date: March 19, 2019Rule 11 Agreement
Date: May 13, 2019Attorney Vacation Letter for Daniel Joseph Fay
Date: August 06, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: May 08, 2020Defendants’ Second Requests For Production To Plaintiff Sharpstown
Date: July 07, 2020FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: December 07, 2020DEFENDANTS SECOND AMENDNED GENERAL DENIAL DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: July 10, 2020Agreement on the Record
Date: July 15, 2020Proposed Order on Defendants' Motion To Compel
Date: July 29, 2020Motion to Enforce Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 15, 2020Proposed Order
Date: July 15, 2020Defendants’ First Requests For Admissions To Plaintiff Sharpstown
Date: July 07, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 07, 2020TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: September 08, 2020Proposed Summary Judgment
Date: September 09, 2020Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Contractual Liability
Date: September 09, 2020Defendant's Motion in Limine
Date: September 24, 2020Plaintiff's Supplemental Petition to Correct Clerical Error
Date: September 15, 2020Defendant's Trial Preparation Statement
Date: September 24, 2020Plaintiff's Motion In Limine
Date: September 25, 2020Plaintiff's Trial Response
Date: September 25, 2020Proposed Order Striking Pleading
Date: September 28, 2020Proposed Order Denying Summary Judgment
Date: September 28, 2020Objection to Trial Setting
Date: September 28, 2020Filing Letter
Date: October 02, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 02, 2020Letter to Opposing Counsel
Date: October 02, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2020Plaintiff's 1st Amended Petition and Application for Injunction and Damages
Date: October 07, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 08, 2020Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading
Date: October 07, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 16, 2020Defendants' Reply To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Petition
Date: October 15, 2020Filing Letter
Date: October 15, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: October 19, 2020Supporting Affidavit of Daniel Joseph Fay
Date: November 25, 2020Filing Letter
Date: October 23, 2020Defendant's Third Amended General Denial Declaratory Judgment and Counterclaim
Date: October 23, 2020ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: November 16, 2020Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Leave
Date: November 03, 2020ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: November 06, 2020Proposed Final Judgment
Date: November 25, 2020Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 09, 2020Proposed Summary Judgment
Date: October 23, 2020Propsoed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration
Date: December 01, 2020Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Leave to file Amended Pleading
Date: November 03, 2020Proposed Order Denying Summary Judgment
Date: November 09, 2020Defendants First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Contractual Liability
Date: October 23, 2020Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleadings
Date: November 04, 2020Order Resetting Trial
Date: October 29, 2020Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Entry
Date: December 02, 2020Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration
Date: December 01, 2020PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION AND DAMAGES
Date: April 18, 2018Proposed Order
Date: April 25, 2018Witness Statements
Date: May 01, 2018Second Letter from HOA and Response
Date: May 01, 2018HOA Approval Letter & Application
Date: May 01, 2018Answer & Timeline
Date: May 01, 2018First Letter from HOA and Response
Date: May 01, 2018DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 30, 2018Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 17, 2018Proposed Judgement Order
Date: November 12, 2018Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiff Sharpstown
Date: April 09, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: August 28, 2019Proposed Summary Judgment Order
Date: October 17, 2018Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Enter Final Judgment
Date: December 04, 2020(Copy) Order to Show Cause
Date: May 18, 2018Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 13, 2020Proposed Ruling And Order
Date: October 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
December 14, 2020 |
RE-HEARING - MOTION FOR Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
December 14, 2020 |
RE-HEARING - MOTION FOR Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) PER SHAWN 12/11 @ 1416 |
||
December 07, 2020 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
December 07, 2020 | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
December 07, 2020 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
December 07, 2020 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) OS 12/7 |
||
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Enter Final Judgment | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.