Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rolls, William, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Buzbee, Anthony Glenn, against Elite Industrial Services Inc, Elite Specialty Welding Llc, Packaging Corporation Of America Inc, represented by Cano, Brian G, Cano, Brian Gregory, Oubre, David A, Oubre, David A., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEAU MILLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House190th |
Plaintiff's Original Petition and Rule 194 Reqeuest for Disclosure
Date: January 08, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: March 07, 2018Proposed Order Sustaining Special Appearance
Date: April 12, 2018Declaration of Bruce Kummerfeldt in Support of PCAs Special Appearance
Date: April 12, 2018Defendant Elite Specialty Welding LLC's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: June 05, 2018Proposed Order on Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: August 15, 2018ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: October 03, 2018Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition
Date: February 08, 2019Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: January 28, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: March 29, 2019Proposed Order on Continuance
Date: July 12, 2019Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order
Date: July 12, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: July 20, 2020Proposed Order Sustaining Special Appearance
Date: July 12, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: July 16, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 16, 2019Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: February 28, 2020Proposed Judgment
Date: March 20, 2020Defendant Packaging Corporation of America's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 20, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 31, 2021DCA Generic Letter
Date: July 15, 2021Civil Process Request
Date: January 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
July 30, 2021 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket CASE SETTLED |
||
July 23, 2021 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SETTING REMINDER | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
January 31, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) | ||
January 31, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL | |
January 18, 2021 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
July 20, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.