Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
El, Charles, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hill, Brett Michael, against Johnson, Dedra Lashawn, represented by Feichtinger, Bruce Martin, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMIKE ENGELHART Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Plaintiff'S Motion |
ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: September 11, 2018Defendants First Amended Answer
Date: August 17, 2018Defendant's Original Answer
Date: November 30, 2017TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: January 16, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 18, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 23, 2020ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: July 21, 2020DCA Generic Letter
Date: December 09, 2020Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: January 26, 2021DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: January 27, 2021Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: January 26, 2021ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2021 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Law Day Docket CASE SETTLED |
||
February 01, 2021 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Law Day Docket |
||
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | |
January 27, 2021 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
January 27, 2021 | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (Final Order) | ||
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
January 18, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE |
||
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.