Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Elliott Electric Supply Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shiels, Thomas, against Circle K Stores Inc, represented by Harrod, Tiffany A., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 334th with STEVEN KIRKLAND presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House334th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
DEFENDANT’S ORIGINAL ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM, AND SUMMARY MOTION TO REMOVE INVALID LIEN
Date: September 22, 2017Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: August 08, 2017DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: October 02, 2017Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: December 14, 2017DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: December 15, 2017Proposed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2019 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting DISPOSED |
||
November 05, 2018 |
COORDINATORS REMINDER Another Docket |
||
December 15, 2017 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
December 15, 2017 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
September 27, 2017 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
September 22, 2017 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.