Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deville, David, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Lazarz, Mark G., against University Of Texas M D Anderson Cancer Center, represented by Leyva, Andrea Gayle, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2017 |
CategoryDiscrimination |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court House165th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Defendant'S Motion |
Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 13, 2017Defendant's Original Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Request for Disclosures
Date: August 11, 2017Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: July 13, 2017DCA Generic Letter
Date: August 22, 2017DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: October 06, 2017Docket Control Order
Date: October 11, 2017Proposed Order on Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 08, 2017Defendants Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 08, 2017Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 30, 2017Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition
Date: November 30, 2017Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 30, 2017Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: December 05, 2017Letter to Judge Hall
Date: May 01, 2018Rule 11 Agreement/extension on deadlines
Date: June 22, 2018Plaintiff's David Deville's Designation of Experts
Date: July 02, 2018Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Response
Date: August 17, 2018Letter to Judge regarding ruling on Plea to the jurisdiction
Date: August 30, 2018Letter to Court
Date: September 06, 2018Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Ruling on Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 16, 2018Filing Letter
Date: December 04, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 26, 2018Opposed Motion for Ruling On Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 08, 2018Proposed Order on Defendant's Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: November 08, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: February 14, 2019Memorandum Opinion (Court of Appeals)
Date: July 30, 2019Letter from the Court of Appeals First District
Date: March 22, 2019DISMISSED ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: August 26, 2019Plaintiffs Notice of Appeal
Date: September 24, 2019Letter from the Court of Appeals First District
Date: October 25, 2019Letter from the Court of Appeals First District
Date: October 29, 2019Letter
Date: November 06, 2019Letter from the Court of Appeals First District
Date: December 05, 2019Order (Court of Appeals for the First District of Texas)
Date: October 29, 2019Request for Documents
Date: October 29, 2019Letter
Date: October 30, 2019Letter from the Court of Appeals First District
Date: December 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter from the Court of Appeals First District | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter from the Court of Appeals First District | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter from the Court of Appeals First District | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order (Court of Appeals for the First District of Texas) | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Documents | |
October 28, 2019 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE DISPOSED |
||
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter from the Court of Appeals First District | |
October 24, 2019 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Trial Coordinators Docket CASE DISPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.