Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Battleground Oil Specialty Terminal Company Llc, Eagle Ship Supply Inc, Johnson, Vandaven, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Itkin, Jason A., Itkin, Jason Aron, against American River Transportation Co Llc, American River Transportation Co., Llc, Atlantic Richfield Company, Battleground Oil Specialty Terminal Company Llc, Boone Towing Inc, (total of 10) See All represented by Flotte, David M., Psarellis, Steven E., Smith, Thomas J., Smith, Thomas Joseph, Swaim, Don, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 295th with DONNA ROTH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House295th |
ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: June 06, 2018Proposed Order
Date: May 30, 2018ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: June 13, 2018Proposed Order
Date: June 29, 2018Defendants' Motion For Leave To Join Third Party Defendants
Date: June 29, 2018Proposed Order
Date: July 11, 2018Defendants' Amended Motion For Entry Of Agreed Docket Control Order:
Date: July 11, 2018DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 12, 2018Proposed Order
Date: July 26, 2018Supplement To Defendants' Motion For Leave To Join Third Party Defendants
Date: August 24, 2018Second Supplement to Motion for Leave to Join Third Party Defendants
Date: August 30, 2018Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2018Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Join Third Party Defendants
Date: August 31, 2018ARTCOs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 14, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 10, 2018Plaintiff's Response to ARTCO's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: September 10, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 28, 2018Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Aaron M. Wolfson, Ph.D.
Date: September 28, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 11, 2018ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: December 19, 2018Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s First Supplemental Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: October 19, 2018Proposed Final Summary Judgment
Date: October 19, 2018Defendant Boone Towing, Inc's Rule 166a(i) No-Evidence Motion for Final Summary Judgment
Date: October 19, 2018Proposed order
Date: October 23, 2018ARTCO's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Todd Cowen, M.D., Life Care Planner
Date: October 19, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: October 26, 2018ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: October 26, 2018Civil Process Request Form
Date: October 31, 2018Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition
Date: October 31, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 05, 2018Plaintiff's Response To Defendant Boone Towing Inc.'s No Evidence Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: November 05, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 09, 2018ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: November 13, 2018Artco's Sur Reply To Bostco's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: August 14, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 21, 2019Proposed Order
Date: May 24, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: June 03, 2019Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to ARTCO's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: May 29, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 03, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 04, 2019ORDER GRANTING STRIKING OF PLEADING IN PART SIGNED
Date: June 04, 2019Defendant Eagle Ship Supply Inc.'s Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: July 03, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 05, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 11, 2019Proposed Order Denying
Date: August 09, 2019Supplemental Production Documents
Date: August 12, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 12, 2019Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 12, 2019Proposed Order Setting Voir Dire of Plaintiffs Expert John Pierce
Date: January 02, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2019Defendant's Motion For Continuance
Date: August 20, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion For Continuance
Date: August 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 26, 2019Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Continuance
Date: August 26, 2019Proposed Order Denying
Date: August 30, 2019Defendant Werner Co.s Motion In Limine
Date: August 28, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: August 30, 2019Civil Process Request 2
Date: June 21, 2017Civil Process Request 3
Date: June 21, 2017Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Original Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: July 24, 2017Civil Process Request
Date: June 21, 2017ARTCO's Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: June 27, 2018Civil Process Request
Date: July 27, 2017Plaintiffs First Amended Petition
Date: July 27, 2017Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Original Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: August 01, 2017Proposed Order Acknowledging Nonsuit without Prejudice
Date: August 03, 2017Original Answer and Verified Denial of Kinder Morgan Battleground oil, LLC
Date: August 07, 2017Defendant Artco's Original Answer
Date: September 18, 2017ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: August 04, 2017DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: November 10, 2017Original Answer and Verified Denial of Kinder Morgan Inc
Date: February 27, 2018Filing Letter
Date: May 22, 2018Proposed Order granting defendants motion for continuance
Date: May 24, 2018Letter regarding Vacation
Date: May 22, 2018Defendants' Opposed Motion For Continuance
Date: May 24, 2018Reply to Plaintiff's Response To Defendants' Motion For Continaunce
Date: June 01, 2018Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for a Continuance
Date: May 30, 2018ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: September 05, 2019Proposed Order Granting
Date: September 11, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 10, 2019Letters Rogatory
Date: October 08, 2019Defendant's Petition For Letters Rogatory
Date: October 08, 2019DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: September 18, 2019ORDER DENYING LETTER ROGATORY SIGNED
Date: November 07, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: December 20, 2019Defendant's Motion For Continuance
Date: December 20, 2019Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of John Pierce
Date: December 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 23, 2019Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Continuance
Date: December 23, 2019Defendant American River Transportion Co., LLC's Motion To Take Judicial Notice of Federal Law
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 03, 2020Plaintiffs Brief Regarding the Applicability of Maritime Law
Date: February 20, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 20, 2020Letter requesting citation
Date: March 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 03, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING COMPLIANCE
Date: March 09, 2020ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: March 09, 2020DOCKET.CONTROL.ORDER
Date: March 12, 2020Defendant, Eagle Ship Supply Inc.'s Responses to Request For Disclosures
Date: March 31, 2020DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 06, 2019ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: February 11, 2019Proposed order
Date: February 01, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: February 05, 2019Defendant Eagle Ship Supply, Inc.'s Original Answer And Request For Disclosures
Date: January 28, 2019Filing Letter
Date: March 15, 2019Defendant Werner Co.'s First Amended Answer
Date: April 04, 2019Plaintiff's Motion to Increase Juror Pay
Date: September 08, 2020Plaintiff's Motion to Equalize Peremptory Strikes
Date: September 08, 2020BOSTCO's Traditional Motion For Summary Judgment For Statutory Indemnity
Date: September 14, 2020Filing Letter:
Date: September 16, 2020Industrial Products Limited, LLC's Motion To Strike BOSTCO's Designation of Expert David J. Martyn
Date: September 18, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 21, 2020Defendant Wiener Co.'s Answer To BOSTCO's Cross- Claim
Date: September 22, 2020Defendant, Eagle Ship Supply, Inc.'s Motion to Strike BOSTCO's Designation of Expert David J. Martyn
Date: September 23, 2020Defendant, Eagle Ship Inc.'s Original Answer and General Denial to Industrial Product's Cross Claim
Date: September 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 23, 2020Defendant Eagle Ship Supply, Inc.'s Original Answer and General Denial To BOSTCO's Cross Claim
Date: September 24, 2020BOSTCO's Response to Motions to Strike Expert Dave Martyn
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order Denying Bostcos Traditional Motion for Summary Judgment for Statutory Indemnity
Date: September 29, 2020Proposed Order Severing BOSTCO's Cross Claim Against Eagle Ship Supply
Date: October 07, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE PLEADING
Date: October 09, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 09, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 09, 2020Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's 3rd Amended Petition
Date: October 09, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 09, 2020Vacation Letter
Date: October 09, 2020BOSTCO's Answer to Industrial Products Limited, LLC's Cross Claim
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Verified Motion for Continuance (Opposed by Plaintiff)
Date: October 12, 2020BOSTCO's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Petition
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Increase Juror Pay
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion to Increase Juror Pay
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant American River Transportation Co. LLCs First Amended Motion/Order in Limine
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant, Eagle Ship Supply Inc.'s Motion in Limine and Order
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant Boone Towing, Inc.'s Motion/Order in Limine
Date: October 12, 2020Plaintiff's First Amended Motions in Limine
Date: October 12, 2020Defendant Werner Co.'s Second Supplement Motion In Limine
Date: October 12, 2020ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING
Date: October 14, 2020ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED
Date: October 14, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTNG PARTIAL MTN TO QUASH DEPO
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING SEPARATE TRIAL
Date: October 14, 2020Defendant Werner Co.'s Third Supplemental Motion In Limine
Date: October 15, 2020Letter to Court
Date: October 16, 2020Letter to Counsel
Date: October 15, 2020Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition
Date: October 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: November 24, 2020Proposed Second Amended Docket Control Order
Date: February 01, 2019ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: June 29, 2021ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PARTIAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGS
Date: December 01, 2020Vacation letter
Date: December 09, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 14, 2020Defendant Werner Co.s First Supplemental Motion In Limine
Date: December 20, 2019Letter to Court from US Legal Support
Date: December 28, 2020Plaintiffs Trial Brief Regarding OSHA Regulations
Date: December 23, 2020Docket Control Order
Date: December 28, 2020Order Granting Eagle Ship Supply, Inc's Motion to Bifurcate Exemplary Damages
Date: December 28, 2020Eagle Ship Supply, Inc.'s Motion to Bifurcate Exemplary Damages
Date: December 28, 2020Plaintiff's Designation of Experts
Date: December 28, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING IN PART EXCLUSION OF EXPERTS OPINIONS
Date: December 29, 2020ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED
Date: December 29, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: December 29, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING BIFURCATE TRIAL
Date: December 29, 2020Vacation Letter
Date: February 18, 2021Vacation Letter
Date: January 11, 2021Attorney Vacation Schedule Request
Date: January 08, 20212021 Attorney Vacation Letter
Date: January 07, 20212021 Attorney Vacation Schedule Request
Date: February 01, 20212021 Attorney Vacation Letter- Steven Psarellis
Date: January 07, 2021ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 13, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 19, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: June 28, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 28, 2021Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: June 21, 2017Proposed Order Granting Motion For Entry Of Docket Control Order
Date: June 25, 2018Defendants' Motion For Entry Of Docket Control Order
Date: June 25, 2018Proposed Order Granting Artcos Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: June 27, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESPONSIBLE 3RD PARTY
Date: June 03, 2019Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Continuance
Date: December 27, 2019Plaintiffs Motion in Limine
Date: December 31, 2019Proposed Judgment Granting Crossclaim
Date: January 02, 2020ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Date: March 09, 2020Defendant ARTCO First Amended Motion/Order in Limine
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 21, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 07, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 05, 2020Proposed Order Denying
Date: October 08, 2020ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING
Date: December 31, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 06, 2020Proposed order
Date: December 20, 2019Defendant Werner Co.'s First Supplemental Motion In Limine
Date: December 20, 2019Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Continuance
Date: December 27, 2019Plaintiff's Motion in Limine
Date: December 31, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 02, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 28, 2020Proposed Order On Applicable Law
Date: March 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 12, 2020Plaintiff's Brief re the Applicability of Maritime Law
Date: February 20, 2020Proposed Order
Date: April 15, 2020Defendant, Eagle Ship Supply's Responses to Request For Disclosures
Date: March 31, 2020Proposed Order Denying
Date: December 28, 2020ORDER SIGNED DENYING EXCLUSION OF EXPERTS OPINIONS
Date: December 29, 2020Defendant BOSTCO's Supplemental Motions in Limine- October 2020
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 23, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 14, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 29, 2020Proposed Order Denying
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 25, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 16, 2020Defendant Werner Co.'s Original Answer And Request For Disclosure
Date: November 16, 2018Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2018Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Leave
Date: June 03, 2019Proposed Order
Date: June 24, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 20, 2019Defendant Werner Co.'s Motion In Limine
Date: August 28, 2019Subpoena Duces Tecum
Date: May 10, 2018Proposed Order
Date: October 08, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 20, 2019Proposed Order Granting
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: January 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
June 29, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE (Temporary Order) | ||
June 29, 2021 |
STATUS CONFERENCE Law Day Docket |
||
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 3 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 2 | |
May 30, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE, IN PART (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.