Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ochiagha, Chima, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Monts,Britton D., against Passco Alanza Brook Lp, represented by Foley, Zandra Elayne, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 113th with RABEEA COLLIER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRABEEA COLLIER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2016 |
CategoryCode Violations |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeZoning |
Filing Court House113th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval
Date: March 29, 2017DEFENDANT PASSCO ALANZA BROOK LP’S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 14, 2016Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: March 29, 2017Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 21, 2016DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: December 14, 2016Exhibit 01 - Settlement Agreement w Exhibits
Date: July 14, 2017Proposed Order and Judgment Approving Settlement
Date: July 14, 2017Proposed Order Granting class action settlement
Date: June 23, 2017Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: July 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2018 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting DISPOSED 7/21/17 |
||
July 21, 2017 | ORD SGND GRANTING MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT (Temporary Order) | ||
July 21, 2017 | ORD SGND GRNTG THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SETTLEMENT FUND (Temporary Order) | ||
July 21, 2017 | ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order) | ||
July 21, 2017 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
July 21, 2017 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
July 21, 2017 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
July 21, 2017 |
MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Law Day Docket |
||
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Exhibit 01 - Settlement Agreement w Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.