Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Apamibola, Isabel Alama (Individually And As Representative Of The, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Roberts, Sean Alan, against Bombardier Inc, Bombardier Transportation, Bombardier Transportation System, City Of Houston, United Airlines Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Henry, Jennifer Pettijohn, Vancil, Troy Layne, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKYLE CARTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2015 |
CategoryPremises |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court House125th |
Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 07, 2015Civil Process Request
Date: July 07, 2015Defendant Bombardier Transporatation (Holdings) USA Incs Original Answer
Date: September 01, 2015Proposed Order
Date: August 26, 2015Plainitffs Original Petition
Date: July 07, 2015Original Answer and Request for Disclosure
Date: August 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2015 |
MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) REMOVED TO FEDERAL 9/4 |
||
September 04, 2015 | REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT | ||
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit E | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit D | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit C | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit F | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Fiing Notice of Removal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.