Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Saenz, Gudalupe, Saenz, Petra, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Maadani, Pejman, against Glenn, Raymond Jr, Ogo Marketing Llc, represented by Odom, David Emmet, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2015 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House165th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
Agreed Motion For Continuance
Date: April 05, 2016ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 13, 2016Civil Process Request
Date: February 20, 2015Defendants' Orignal Answer
Date: March 23, 2015Proposed Final Judgment For Plaintiff Guadalupe Saenz
Date: July 01, 2016Docket Control Order/Standing Order Requiring Electronic Filing/Court's ADR Policies
Date: March 30, 2015Defendants' Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: February 19, 2016ORD SGND DENYING MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT
Date: July 11, 2016Proposed Final Judgment for P. Petra Saenz
Date: July 12, 2016DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: July 28, 2016Plaintiffs' Original Petition
Date: February 20, 2015Proposed Order
Date: April 05, 2016DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: April 21, 2016Agreed Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 28, 2016proposed Order of Dismissal
Date: July 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2016 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE DISPOSED DISMISSAL |
||
August 04, 2016 |
MTN TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Law Day Docket PER EMAIL/RICK/MAADANI |
||
July 28, 2016 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
July 28, 2016 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Dismiss | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | proposed Order of Dismissal | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | deputy reporter statement | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Petra Saenz's Motion for Enforcement of settlement agreement and motion for sanctions | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Final Judgment for P. Petra Saenz |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.