Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Williford, Alice Kaylynn, against Allen, Marcus Tremaine, Approximately $1,319.00, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySeizure & Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
NO COSTS ALLOCATED
Date: August 29, 2018Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit
Date: August 22, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: June 22, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: July 09, 2018Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion For Non-suit
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
August 29, 2018 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | |
August 27, 2018 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket CASE DISP |
||
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion For Non-suit | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DCA Generic Letter | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Seizure and Forfeiture) | |
December 31, 2014 | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.