Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Broussard, Emma, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by Hardeway, Grant U. Sr., against Glynn, M, Glynn, Mercell Delores, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 127th with R. K. SANDILL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House127th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Summary Judgment Signed |
Plaintiff's Original Petition for Declaratory Judgment
Date: December 31, 2014ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED
Date: March 04, 2016DCA Generic Letter
Date: February 18, 2016Proposed Order on Motion of Indigence
Date: July 27, 2016DCA Generic Letter
Date: September 16, 2015Civil Process Request Form
Date: July 14, 2015CASE SUMMARY
Date: August 20, 2015MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: October 15, 2015Proposed Order Granting Motion for Other Substitut
Date: February 20, 2015Proposed Order
Date: October 15, 2015Proposed Order on Motion of Indigence
Date: July 05, 2016Motion of Indigence
Date: July 05, 2016Proposed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: July 14, 2015Motion of Indigence
Date: July 27, 2016Proposed Order Granting Declaratory Judgment
Date: March 23, 2018Proposed Order on Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Date: April 24, 2017Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 05, 2018Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Date: April 24, 2017DCA Generic Letter
Date: March 27, 2017Plaintiff's First Amended Petition for Declaratory Judgment
Date: November 30, 2017Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 05, 2018FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: July 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2018 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
July 08, 2018 | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
July 08, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
July 02, 2018 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MOTION FOR FINAL (TRCP 166A) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) ORDER SIGNED 07.08.18 |
||
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission | |
May 01, 2018 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Law Day Docket MTN NEEDED/MSJ ON SUBMISSION DKT |
||
April 24, 2018 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Law Day Docket HARDEWAY CALLED 3/29 |
||
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.