Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goose Creek Cisd, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Hospital District, Port Of Houston Authority Of Harris County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Benoit, Brandon Eric, against Harbert, Bernard, Herbert. Jennifer, Hughes, Jessy, Hughes, Georgia Mae, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 333rd with DARYL L. MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House333rd |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2014PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 22, 2015Notice Regarding Dismissal
Date: August 28, 20152014-74698 Herbert's Answers
Date: July 23, 2015Notice of Intent to Dismiss
Date: November 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss | |
November 03, 2015 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
November 03, 2015 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
October 14, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Dismissal | |
July 23, 2015 | ANSWER | ||
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | 2014-74698 Herbert's Answers | |
July 22, 2015 | FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.