Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Baytown, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Benoit, Brandon Eric, against Flores, Miguel Andres, Michel, Eva, Michel, Jose Angel, Ramirez, Benjamin Jr, Goose Creek Consolidated Isd And Lee College District, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House152nd |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 27, 2018plaintiffs original petition
Date: December 31, 2014Intervenors Original Petition
Date: February 06, 2015Notice of Intent to Dismiss
Date: October 12, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
March 27, 2018 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
March 27, 2018 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 14, 2018 | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION RECOMM ENDED | ||
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Requesting Issuance Of Service | |
November 18, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
October 28, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.