Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Office Of Attorney General, 615, against Salter, Tiffany Janell, Showers, Don Juan, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 312th with CLINTON WELLS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryIv-D Oag Only-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House312th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2015 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
December 15, 2015 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
December 15, 2015 |
PATERNITY MOTION FOR Title IV-D Trial Docket |
||
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
September 22, 2015 | ORDER GRANTING BLOOD TEST SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
September 22, 2015 |
PATERNITY MOTION FOR Title IV-D Trial Docket EXPARTE DNA ORD.GRTD. |
||
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING BLOOD TEST SIGNED | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation, Precept, & Affidavit Don Juan Showers | |
July 07, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Title IV-D Trial Docket NO PARTIES |
||
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (Executed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.