Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Office Of Attorney General, 615, against Reyes, Samantha, Reyes, Pj, represented by Pinney, Marcus Dale, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 310th with SONYA HEATH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryEstablishment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House310th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2015 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
July 13, 2015 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
July 09, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Title IV-D Trial Docket |
||
April 14, 2015 |
MOTION FOR ORAL HEARING Title IV-D Hearing (AG) N\S |
||
March 31, 2015 | IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING (Temporary Order) | ||
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | IV-D MASTER SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Setting Hearing to Contest Confirmation of Non-Agreed Child Support Review Order | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation (CSRP) | |
March 02, 2015 | ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.