Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House190th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Original Petition in Intervention
Date: January 23, 2014PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 31, 2013Judgment Checklist and Master's Report
Date: May 21, 2014CIVL PROCESS REQUEST
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2014 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
July 09, 2014 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
June 16, 2014 | DEFAULT RECOMMENDED | ||
June 16, 2014 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
May 21, 2014 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARD, NO RULING MADE | ||
May 21, 2014 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Tax Docket (Trial) JDMT SUBMITTED |
||
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Checklist and Master's Report | |
April 17, 2014 | INTERVENTION | ||
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.