Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bolen, Troy Dean, against Parker, Carla, represented by Johnson, Jonathon Chadwick, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 113th with RABEEA COLLIER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House113th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Plaintiff'S Motion |
Trial Preparation Order
Date: August 04, 2014Proposed Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
Date: March 13, 2015Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Contnuance
Date: October 24, 2014Docket Control Order
Date: March 30, 2015Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Continuance
Date: March 13, 2015DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: August 07, 2015Filing letter
Date: December 31, 2013Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2013Filing letter
Date: January 21, 2014Defendant Carla Parker s original answer and disclosre requests to the plaintiffs
Date: January 21, 2014Plaintiff's Verifed Motion for Continuance
Date: October 24, 2014Docket Control Order
Date: October 31, 2014ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: October 31, 2014Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 16, 2015Trial Preparation Order
Date: January 07, 2015TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER
Date: May 15, 2015Proposed order of Dismissal with prejudice
Date: July 30, 2015Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice
Date: July 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2015 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
August 07, 2015 | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (Final Order) | ||
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed order of Dismissal with prejudice | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice | |
July 20, 2015 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CASE DISPOSED |
||
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Business Records Affidavit | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Business Records Affidavit | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | TRIAL.PREPARATION.ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.