Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texad Attorney General, Palacios, Robert Joseph, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Palacios, Christy Ann, Palacios, Robert Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 311th with GERMAINE TANNER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House311th |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 | FOCAS PROJECT - DISQUALIFICATION | ||
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Of Assignment Of Wages | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Undeliverable Return Mail | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Requset for notice to employer of income withholding | |
March 16, 2015 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
March 16, 2015 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 16, 2015 | FOCAS PROJECT - IN(Temporary Order) | ||
March 16, 2015 | ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT (Temporary Order) | ||
March 16, 2015 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES (Temporary Order) | ||
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.