Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HT HOUSTON PORTFOLIO L P (A DELAWARE LIM vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT
On September 13, 2013 an appeal appraisal board case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX. Judge LAUREN REEDER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2013
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
Harris County, TX
Filing Court House
234th
Category
APPEAL APPRAISAL BOARD
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Outcome Type
AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Status
Stipulated Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: Oct 07, 2015NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER
Date: Oct 05, 2015Proposed Agreed Final Judgment
Date: Oct 01, 2015ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: Jun 23, 2015ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: Jun 22, 2015Trial Preparation Order
Date: May 14, 2015ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL
Date: Apr 27, 2015Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance
Date: Mar 27, 2015Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance
Date: Mar 27, 2015Plaintiffs Motion in Limine
Date: Mar 27, 2015Proposed Order
Date: Mar 06, 2015Trial Preparation Order
Date: Feb 20, 2015PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND
Date: Dec 04, 2014Proposed Agreed Protective Order
Date: Nov 26, 2014DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: Nov 18, 2014ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: Nov 17, 2014Defendants First Amended Answer
Date: Nov 07, 2014Plaintiffs First Amended Petition
Date: Nov 06, 2014Trial Preparation Order
Date: Oct 22, 2014Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio LPs Motion for Protective Order
Date: Sep 05, 2014Proposed Protective Order
Date: Sep 05, 2014Proposed Order
Date: Sep 05, 2014DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: Apr 14, 2014Proposed Agreed Amended Docket Control Order
Date: Mar 27, 2014Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: Mar 27, 2014DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: Oct 16, 2013Defendants Original Answer and Request for Disclosure
Date: Oct 09, 2013Defendants Original Answer and Request for Disclosure
Date: Oct 09, 2013Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: Sep 13, 2013Civil Process Request
Date: Sep 13, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2015 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) AGR J/S 10/7/15 |
||
October 19, 2015 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting PER S. GIBBS OF ATP 9/29 |
||
October 07, 2015 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
October 07, 2015 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Final Judgment | |
September 30, 2015 | SETTLEMENT ANNOUNCED NOT ON RECORD | ||
September 30, 2015 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
July 27, 2015 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Rule 193.7 Notice | |
June 23, 2015 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) | ||
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL | |
June 22, 2015 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE (Temporary Order) | ||
June 22, 2015 |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (CIVIL) Law Day Docket O/S 6/22/15 |
||
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Motion for Continuance | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Second Agreed Motion for Continuance | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Trial Preparation Order | |
April 27, 2015 | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL(Temporary Order) | ||
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED RESETTING TRIAL | |
April 06, 2015 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CONT TO 7/27-NEVER FILED WAIVER |
||
March 30, 2015 | MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE GRANTED | ||
March 30, 2015 |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (CIVIL) Law Day Docket ORALLY GRNT/VAC WAIVER TO FOLLOW |
||
March 30, 2015 |
STRIKE PLEAD - MTN TO (TRCP 168) Law Day Docket MOOT |
||
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio L.P.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Continuance | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 12 | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 11 | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 13 | |
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 10 | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Evidence | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Trial Witness List | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Motion in Limine | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Contribution to the Trial Preparation Order | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Exhibit List | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Proposed Charge of the Court | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion in Limine | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Witness List | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Parties and Attorneys List | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Estimated Trial Scheduling | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Attachment | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Exhibit List | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio L.P.'s Proposed Draft Jury Charge | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio LP's Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio, LP's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Continuance | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 9 | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 7 | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 6 | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 5 | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 8 | |
March 23, 2015 |
DOCKET CALL Trial Coordinators Docket MAY WAIVE JURY |
||
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration of Paula Thoreen | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 4 | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 2 | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Exhibit 3 | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert as to Claims Under $ 42.26 Tex.Tax Code | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Trial Preparation Order | |
December 08, 2014 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting CONT TO 4/6/15 |
||
December 04, 2014 | PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND(Temporary Order) | ||
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | PROTECTIVE ORDER (CIVIL) ORD SGND | |
December 01, 2014 |
MTN FOR PROTECTION Law Day Docket PER ATTY. GIPS;11/26 |
||
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Protective Order | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
November 24, 2014 |
MTN FOR PROTECTION Law Day Docket PER JUDGE;11/13 |
||
November 18, 2014 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
November 17, 2014 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE (Temporary Order) | ||
November 17, 2014 |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (CIVIL) Law Day Docket O/S 11/17/14 |
||
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | First Amended Notice of Hearing | |
November 07, 2014 | FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant's First Amended Answer | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 06, 2014 | FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs First Amended Petition | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial Preparation Order | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | HT Houston Portfolio, LP's Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Defendant Harris County Appraisal District's Non-Party Subpoena | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff HT Houston Portfolio LP's Motion for Protective Order | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Protective Order | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jason Birken | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 04 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 05 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 01 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 03 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 06 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit 02 | |
June 16, 2014 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting R/S TO 12/8/14 |
||
April 14, 2014 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of trial | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Amended Docket Control Order | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion for Continuance | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ADDITIONAL ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY-IN-CHARGE AND ATTORNEYS OF RECORD | |
January 03, 2014 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) | ||
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant's Request for Jury Trial | |
October 16, 2013 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of trial | |
October 14, 2013 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
October 09, 2013 | ANSWER | ||
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendants Original Answer and Request for Disclosure | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation Corporate | |
September 13, 2013 | ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Process Request | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet |