Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pasadena Independent School District, San Jacinto Community College District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against A I S Services L L C, American Residential Mortgage Corporation, City Of Pasadena Texas, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, (total of 11) See All represented by Linebarger, Goggan Blair & Sampson, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 215th with ELAINE H PALMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House215th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
Civil Process Request
Date: December 31, 2012Original Petition in Intervention
Date: February 20, 2013Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Notice of Joint Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2014NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: February 26, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2014 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
February 26, 2014 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Joint Dismissal | |
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
June 19, 2013 | DISCLAIMER | ||
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
June 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Intervenors Disclaimer | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Secretary of State | |
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.