Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pasadena Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against City Of Houston Texas, Harris County, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, Harris Cunty Department Of Education, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House011th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
Civil Process Request
Date: December 31, 2012NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: May 14, 2013Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Notice of Dismissal
Date: May 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2013 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
May 14, 2013 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
May 14, 2013 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 31, 2012 | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.