Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hastings Green Home Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Holland, Brian E., against Roberts, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House190th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Proposed Order
Date: June 10, 2013Proposed Order
Date: August 06, 2013Plaintiffs Motion to Retain
Date: August 06, 2013Letter regarding Order Of Sale
Date: May 11, 2015execution and order of sale
Date: April 04, 2014Full Satisfaction and Release of Judgment
Date: August 12, 2015Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2012Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Answer Filed
Date: June 14, 2013Proposed Judgment
Date: August 15, 2013Execution and order of sale
Date: April 14, 2014Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Answer Filed
Date: August 19, 2013Request for Writ of Execution/Order of Sale
Date: January 15, 2014ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET
Date: August 16, 2013Alias execution and order of sale
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Full Satisfaction and Release of Judgment | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Alias execution and order of sale | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter regarding Order Of Sale | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Execution and order of sale | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | execution and order of sale | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Execution/Order of Sale | |
October 28, 2013 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Mail-Undeliverable | |
September 11, 2013 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
September 11, 2013 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.