Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lopez, Esmeralda H, Lopez, Adolph, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Streety, Stephen P., against Hrc Renovations & Construction Llc, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 270th with DEDRA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House270th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Civil Process Request
Date: December 31, 2012Final Judgment
Date: August 16, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2013 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
September 09, 2013 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
September 09, 2013 | ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES (Temporary Order) | ||
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
August 19, 2013 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (MOTION TO) (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 16, 2013 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
August 16, 2013 |
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket JUDGMENT TO BE SUBMITTED8/16 |
||
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.