Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Urbina, Angelica, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Farah, George, against Kroger Co, Kroger Texas L P, represented by Akers, Brock C., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategorySlip And Fall Damages |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court House011th |
Plaintiffs Original Petition, Request for Disclosure, Request for Production and Interrogatories
Date: December 31, 2012Defendants Original Answer
Date: January 25, 2013Defendants First Amended Original Answer
Date: February 12, 2013DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: April 01, 2013Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: August 22, 2013Letter Regarding Mediated Settlement Agreement
Date: November 07, 2013Proposed Final Judgment
Date: November 22, 2013AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: December 05, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2014 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
December 05, 2013 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
December 05, 2013 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Final Judgment | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Regarding Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Reporters Certificate Oral Deposition of Mike Magelky September 10, 2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.