Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Patton, Cole David, against Knapick, Staci Diane, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeURSULA A. HALL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryExpedited Foreclosure Proceeding |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House165th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
home equity foreclosure application
Date: December 30, 2011NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: June 06, 2012Proposed Order
Date: June 04, 2012Notice of Intent to Dismiss- No Answer
Date: April 25, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2012 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Another Docket CASE DISPOSED |
||
June 06, 2012 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
June 06, 2012 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss- No Answer | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | notice of foreclosure of lien on home equity loan | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
December 30, 2011 | ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.