Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District, Harris County Fresh Water Supply District 1A, Lee College District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Benoit, Brandon Eric, against Acosta, Modesto, Acosta, Rafael, Acosta, Santiago, Acosta, Teddy, Ebbets Partners Ltd, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 281st with CHRISTINE WEEMS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTINE WEEMS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House281st |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2011Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: January 25, 2012Civil process request
Date: December 30, 2011letter
Date: February 14, 2012Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution
Date: July 10, 2013DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 13, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2013 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
November 13, 2013 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
September 30, 2013 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket O/S 11/13/13 |
||
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | letter | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | secretary of state |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.