Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of Pasadena Texas, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospitals District, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against City Of Pasadena Texas, Guillot, Carol Jean, Guillot, David Joseph, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 151st with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMIKE ENGELHART Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House151st |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2011Civil Process Request
Date: December 30, 2011Original Petition in Intervention
Date: January 26, 2012Notice of Dismissal
Date: June 11, 2012DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 28, 2012NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)
Date: June 11, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2012 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
June 28, 2012 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
June 12, 2012 | DISMISSAL RECOMMENDED | ||
June 12, 2012 |
MOTION TO DISMISS Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
June 11, 2012 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)(Temporary Order) | ||
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162) | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice OF Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.