Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kapur, Ramesh, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Browne, Richard S., against Campus, Phil, Newport Fund Llc, Startex Tile Company Llc, represented by Fitch, Charles E., Smith, Stephen A., Kasprzak, Daniel J., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT K. SCHAFFER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House152nd |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 11, 2012defendants original answer and plea to the jurisdiction
Date: January 12, 2012Defendant's amended original answer and amended plea to the jurisdiction
Date: January 17, 2012Proposed Order
Date: February 07, 2012filing letter
Date: January 12, 2012proposed Order
Date: July 12, 2012ORDER SIGNED GRANTING SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: July 17, 2012ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: July 12, 2012Newport Fund LLC's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 20, 2012Trial preparation order
Date: December 10, 2012Proposed Order
Date: December 20, 2012Proposed order denying defendant's no-evidence motion for summary judgment
Date: January 07, 2013Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Startex Title Cmpany, LLC
Date: December 26, 2012ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED
Date: January 28, 2013Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 07, 2013Plaintiff's PreTrial Response
Date: January 07, 2013Proposed Final Judgment
Date: February 01, 2013Proposed Order Granting Non-Suit
Date: February 01, 2013ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: February 04, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2013 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
February 04, 2013 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Final Judgment | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Granting Non-Suit | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Suit for Defendant Newport Fund LLC's Counterclaim Against Plaintiff | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Cover letter | |
January 28, 2013 | ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
January 21, 2013 |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT - MOTION FOR FINAL (TRCP 166A) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) ORDER SIGNED 1-28-13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.