Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Metal Sales Manufacturing Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dillard, Christina Vines, against Thomson, James Michael, Thomson Piping & Casing Inc, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 113th with RABEEA COLLIER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRABEEA COLLIER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House113th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Civil Process Request
Date: January 13, 2011Metal Sales Manufacturing Corporation's Original Petition
Date: January 13, 2011Proposed Final Judgment
Date: February 23, 2011Motion to Modify Judgment and Motion to Enter Agreed Final Judgment
Date: April 07, 2011Proposed Agreed Final Judgment
Date: April 07, 2011Proposed Order
Date: April 07, 2011ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED
Date: April 12, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2011 |
MOTION TO ENTER NUNC PRO TUNC Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
April 12, 2011 | ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
April 12, 2011 | MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT GRANTED | ||
April 12, 2011 | REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER(Temporary Order) | ||
April 12, 2011 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
April 12, 2011 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify Judgment and Motion to Enter Agreed Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.