Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Morales, Maria Elisa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bormaster, Ryan Bradley, against Tran, Nhat-Tu Hoang, represented by Rubin, Leonard Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 157th with TANYA GARRISON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House157th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: January 02, 2012Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Nhat-Tu Hoang Tran
Date: December 31, 2010Plaintiffs 1st Request for Admissions to Defendant
Date: December 31, 2010Plaintiffs First Requests for Production to the Defendant Nhat-Tu Hoang Tran
Date: December 31, 2010Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2010Filing letter
Date: May 26, 2011Designation of Experts
Date: June 21, 2011Defendant nhat-tu hoang tran's original answer
Date: May 26, 2011Rule 11 Agreement
Date: October 28, 2011Filing letter
Date: June 29, 2011Filing letter
Date: July 21, 2011Proposed Order of Non-suit
Date: December 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
January 02, 2012 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
January 02, 2012 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed Order of Non-suit | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | FREEfax Cover Sheet | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Notice of Non-suit with Prejudice | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Reporters Certification for the Oral Deposition Maria Elisa Morales September 23, 2011 | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Filing letter | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Defendants Notice Of Filing Counter-Affidavits of Walter Sassard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.