Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Atascocita West Community Improvement Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tollett, Luke Patrick, against Tandy, Willamian K, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 333rd with DARYL L. MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House333rd |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Intent to dismiss for want of prosecution notice
Date: March 24, 2011intent to dismiss for want of prosecution notice
Date: May 03, 2011Proposed Order
Date: April 18, 2011PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 30, 2010AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 26, 2011ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET
Date: April 26, 2011Proposed Agreed Judgment
Date: May 24, 2011Plaintiffs Motion to Retain
Date: April 18, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2011 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
May 26, 2011 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
May 26, 2011 | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed Agreed Judgment | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | intent to dismiss for want of prosecution notice | |
May 02, 2011 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket RETAINED 90 DYS |
||
April 26, 2011 | ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET (Temporary Order) | ||
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.