Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lakecrest Forest And Village Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tollett, Luke Patrick, against Hooten, Diana L, Tanner, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 234th with LAUREN REEDER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House234th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Filing letter
Date: March 25, 2011Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2010Proposed judgment
Date: March 25, 2011Request for Execution and Order of Sale
Date: July 11, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Execution and Order of Sale | |
May 02, 2011 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket DISPOSED |
||
April 11, 2011 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
April 11, 2011 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
April 11, 2011 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Law Day Docket ORDER 4/11/11 |
||
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Filing letter | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Proposed judgment | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit C | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit A-1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.