Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Shiraz Inwood Oaks Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Sheena, Danny M., against City Of Houston, City Of Houston Buildings And Standards Commission, represented by Miller, D, Pourteau, Bertrand L. Ii, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 295th with CHRISTINE WEEMS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House295th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
Proposed order
Date: November 16, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING
Date: November 18, 2011Proposed Order
Date: January 25, 2012City of Houston Building and Standars Commissions Supplement to Its Original Answer
Date: January 25, 2012ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA TO JURISDICTION IN PART SEE D/S
Date: February 10, 2012Proposed Order of Nonsuit
Date: February 13, 2012ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: January 13, 2011Civil Process Request
Date: December 30, 2010City of Houston Building and Standards Commissions Original Answer
Date: February 14, 2011Houstons Original Answer
Date: February 08, 2011DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: April 29, 2011Porposed Order Granting Houston's Motion for Expedited Trial Setting
Date: November 10, 2011Houston's Request for Expedited Trial Setting
Date: November 10, 2011Objection to Plaintiffs Requests for Disclosures and Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 25, 2012Objection to Plaintiff's Requests for Disclosures and Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 25, 2012Houstons Supplemental to Its Original Answer
Date: January 25, 2012Partial Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: January 25, 2012Proposed Order
Date: February 10, 2012ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: February 14, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2012 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting TO 2/20/12 |
||
February 20, 2012 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting DISPOSED |
||
February 15, 2012 |
MTN FOR PROTECTION Law Day Docket PER DENISE MILLER 2/14/12 |
||
February 14, 2012 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
February 14, 2012 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Order of Nonsuit | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice | |
February 10, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA TO JURISDICTION IN PART SEE D/S | |
February 10, 2012 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PLEA TO JURISDICTION IN PART SEE D/S (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.