Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Emergency Services District #01, Harris County Emergency Services District #19, Harris County Flood Control District, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Bailey, Jason L., against Flores, Ismael, Flores, Yolanda, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 165th with URSULA A. HALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House165th |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment Signed |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2010Plaintiff's Second Amended Petition
Date: June 23, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2012 | ORDER SGND GRANTING SALE OF PROPERTY(Temporary Order) | ||
March 12, 2012 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
March 12, 2012 | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED | |
February 24, 2012 | DEFAULT RECOMMENDED | ||
February 24, 2012 | HOLD FOR JUDGMENT | ||
February 01, 2012 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARD, NO RULING MADE | ||
February 01, 2012 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Tax Docket (Trial) JDMT SUBMITTED |
||
January 25, 2012 | AMENDED INTERVENTION | ||
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.