Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon (Fka The Bank Of New York As Trustee For The, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Yates, Nathan George, against Thomson, Mary Frances, Thomson, Randy Wade, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 270th with DEDRA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryExpedited Foreclosure Proceeding |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House270th |
Filing letter
Date: January 19, 2010Filing letter
Date: March 02, 2010Verified Tex. Rule Civ. P. 736 application for home equity foreclosure order
Date: December 31, 2009Proposed home equity foreclosure order
Date: March 02, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2010 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
March 23, 2010 | EXPEDITED DEFAULT JDGMT SGND(Final Order) | ||
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | EXPEDITED DEFAULT JDGMT SGND | |
March 15, 2010 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) O/S-3/23/10 |
||
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Filing letter | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proposed home equity foreclosure order | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission;3/15 | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Applicant's servicemember's Affidavit | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate of last known address | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Filing letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.