Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District And Lee College, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Benoit, Brandon Eric, against City Of Baytown, Community Resource Credit Union, Harris County, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 164th with MICHAEL LANDRUM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House164th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2009NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO ANSWER FILED
Date: September 09, 2010civil process request
Date: December 31, 2009DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 19, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
October 19, 2010 | PLAINTIFF COSTS | ||
October 19, 2010 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
October 11, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO ANSWER FILED | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | civil process request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.