Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed a(n) Products Liability case represented by Pfeiffer, Ronnie Earl, against Airtight Insulation Of South Texas, Jett, Todd, Lapolla Industries Inc, represented by Gardner, Karl Van, Reese, Wade B., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 113th with RABEEA COLLIER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryProducts Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House113th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
Plaintiffs First Amended Original Petition & request for disclosure
Date: August 27, 2010Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Designation of Experts
Date: October 15, 2010Agreed Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 03, 2012ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: September 29, 2011Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosure
Date: December 31, 2009DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: July 18, 2012Letter regarding 12/31/09 request
Date: January 05, 2010Defendant Lapolla Industries Inc s original answer
Date: February 16, 2010Rule 11 Agreement
Date: April 29, 2010Defendant, Lapolla industries, INC.'s Designation of Experts
Date: October 12, 2010Civil Process Request
Date: August 27, 2010DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: July 28, 2010Plaintiffs Designation of experts
Date: October 15, 2010Filing letter
Date: October 15, 2010Proposed Order
Date: November 19, 2010Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel
Date: December 03, 2010Joint and Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: April 15, 2011ORDER SIGNED COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Date: December 13, 2010Proposed Order Granting motion for continuance
Date: April 15, 2011Defendant, LaPolla Industries, Inc.s First Amended Original Answer
Date: April 18, 2011Docket control order
Date: April 21, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: April 21, 2011Defendant LaPolla Industries Inc's First Amended Original Answer
Date: June 20, 2011Proposed Order
Date: July 03, 2012PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: September 22, 2011Filing letter
Date: June 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2012 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
July 18, 2012 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Agreed Motion to Dismiss | |
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 20, 2012 | MOTION TO REMOVE TRIAL READY STATUS GRANTED | ||
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED | |
September 29, 2011 | ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
September 26, 2011 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting DISPOSED 9/22/11 |
||
September 22, 2011 | PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.