Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Galena Park Independent School District, Harris County Water Control And Improvement District #36, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Emergency Services District # 12, Harris County Flood Control District, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by East, Robert Gregory, against Franco, Francisco, San Jacinto Community College District, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 270th with DEDRA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House270th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Plaintiff's First Amended Petition
Date: April 15, 2010Original Petition in Intervention
Date: January 12, 2010Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2009DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 29, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of DWOP | |
March 29, 2011 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
March 29, 2011 | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (Final Order) | ||
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 21, 2011 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to DWOP | |
June 09, 2010 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Tax Docket (Trial) WRONG DKT DATE |
||
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's First Amended Petition | |
April 15, 2010 | FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.