Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Harvey, Kelly, against Gonzalez, Johnny C, Gonzalez, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with MICHAEL GOMEZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryExpedited Foreclosure Proceeding |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House011th |
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: January 04, 2010Notice of Application for Foreclosure
Date: January 07, 2010Application for Expedited Foreclosure in Regard to Home Equity Loan
Date: December 31, 2009Proposed Order to Proceed with Notice of Foreclosure Sale and Foreclosure
Date: February 23, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2010 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
March 22, 2010 | EXPEDITED DEFAULT JDGMT SGND(Final Order) | ||
March 22, 2010 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Law Day Docket 3/22 ORDER SIGNED |
||
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | EXPEDITED DEFAULT JDGMT SGND | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to Proceed with Notice of Foreclosure Sale and Foreclosure | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Default Motion for Entry of Order for Foreclosure | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit B | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit C | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.