Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ag Child Support, 610, Martinez, Bertha, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Ag Child Support, 610, against Martinez, Carlos Jose, Martinez, Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 309th with LINDA MARIE DUNSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLINDA MARIE DUNSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2004 |
CategoryTitle-4 Other Family |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House309th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Non-Adversary (Non-Jury) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Capias-Family | |
October 14, 2019 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
October 14, 2019 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (TRCP 162) (FAMILY) (Final Order) | ||
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event | SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
October 09, 2019 | ORD SGND GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF CAPIAS (Temporary Order) | ||
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Capias | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order to Withdraw Capias | |
December 26, 2018 | ORD SGND GRNTNG DISCHARGE OF AD LITEM(Temporary Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.