Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pasadena Independent School District, San Jacinto Community College District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against Harris County & Related Entities, Vo, Jack, Jack Vo, Pasadena Independent School District, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House152nd |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Agreement Of Parties |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2008Original Petition In Intervention
Date: February 03, 2009Motion of joint dismissal
Date: June 04, 2010DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES
Date: June 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES | |
June 30, 2010 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
June 30, 2010 | DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES (Final Order) | ||
June 28, 2010 | DISMISSAL RECOMMENDED | ||
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Master in chancery's report to the district court | |
June 11, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion of joint dismissal | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to DWOP | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | District Clerk Receipt | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Petition In Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.