Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of South Houston Texas, Harris County, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, Port Of Houston Authority Of Harris County, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against City Of South Houston Texas, Garcia, Janie, Garcia, Jesus, Harris County, Harris County Flood Control District, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 125th with KYLE CARTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKYLE CARTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House125th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
Original Petition In Intervention
Date: February 03, 2009Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: December 31, 2008Civil Process Request
Date: December 31, 2008Notice of intent to dismiss
Date: April 07, 2010NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: April 27, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
April 27, 2010 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
April 27, 2010 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to dismiss | |
March 31, 2009 | INTERVENTION | ||
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Intervention | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Original Petition In Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.