Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pasadena Independent School District Of Harris County, San Jacinto Community College District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Flood Control District, Harris County Hospital District, Port Of Houston Authority Of Harris County, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 189th with SCOT DOLLINGER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCOT DOLLINGER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House189th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
plaintiff's original petition
Date: December 31, 2008original petition in intervention
Date: February 03, 2009civil process request
Date: December 31, 2008NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: February 09, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
February 09, 2010 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
February 09, 2010 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice | |
July 07, 2009 |
DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239) Tax Docket (Trial) PER-JOYNER |
||
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice Of Default Judgment Hearing | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | citation (tax suit) | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | original petition in intervention | |
February 03, 2009 | INTERVENTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.