Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pasadena Independent School District Of Harris County Texas, San Jacinto Community College District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Joyner, Dexter D., against Any And All Defendants In Plaintiff'S Petition Or Amendments Thereto, City Of South Houston Texas, Harris County, Harris County Department Of Education, Harris County Flood Control District, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 280th with MIKE ENGELHART presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court House280th |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit/Dismissal, Final (Rule 162) |
Plaintiffs original petition
Date: December 31, 2008Original petition in intervention
Date: February 03, 2009Civil process request
Date: December 31, 2008Notice of intent to dismissal for 5/24
Date: April 23, 2010ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: October 03, 2009NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)
Date: April 29, 2010Notice of intent to dismiss
Date: April 08, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2010 |
DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A) Tax Docket (Trial) |
||
April 29, 2010 | DEFENDANT COSTS | ||
April 29, 2010 | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)(Final Order) | ||
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162) | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to dismissal for 5/24 | |
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of intent to dismiss | |
October 03, 2009 | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
October 03, 2009 | TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT | ||
October 03, 2009 | TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT | ||
October 03, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.